TX HB154 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the termination of the parent-child relationship and the duty to pay child support in circumstances involving mistaken paternity.
Title
Relating to the termination of the parent-child relationship and the duty to pay child support in circumstances involving mistaken paternity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - HB 154Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-13 | House | Filed |