TX HB1477 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a court order to disannex an area from a municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a court order to disannex an area from a municipality.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-25HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2013-02-25HouseRead first time
2013-02-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback