TN SJR1489 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Officer Joseph McKinney, Memphis Police Department
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Officer Joseph "Rusty" McKinney of the Memphis Police Department.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Taylor [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] |
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Sen. Randy McNally [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: UNFINISHED BUSINESS MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: UNFINISHED BUSINESS MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |