TN SB2911 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the purchase or possession of a firearm by a person under 25 years of age if the person was previously adjudicated delinquent for an act that, if committed by an adult, would have constituted one or more certain offenses; allows the Tennessee bureau of investigation access to juvenile court records for the limited purpose of performing a background check prior to the purchase or transfer of a firearm to determine whether a person has been adjudicated as a mental defective or committed to a mental health institution at 16 years of age or older, as required by federal law, or is prohibited from purchasing a firearm because of an adjudication as delinquent. - Amends TCA Title 18; Title 37 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 18; Title 37 and Title 39, relative to juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 1 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1600 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 8