TN SB2763 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 24, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 24, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, preempts the entire field of legislation regarding extreme risk protection orders to the exclusion of all county, city, town, municipality, or metropolitan government law, ordinances, resolutions, enactments, or regulation; declares a federal statute, rule, executive order, or a federal judicial order that has the effect of enforcing an extreme risk protection order to be null and void; creates a Class A misdemeanor offense of attempting to enforce a federally implemented extreme risk protection order. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 38 and Title 39, relative to extreme risk protection orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Brent Taylor [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 24, PNV 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1130) |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0983) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 22, Nays 6 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0942) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2035 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.