TN SB2287 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor of knowingly or recklessly permitting a child under 12 years of age to have access to or possession, custody, or use of a firearm unless the person has the permission of the child's parent or guardian, the child is under the supervision of an adult, and the firearm was used for lawful sporting activity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2350 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.