TN SB2263 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for the offense of threatening to commit an act of mass violence on school property or at a school-related activity from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to threats of mass violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2198 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.