TN SB2056 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 989
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 989
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that it is not a violation of a "red alone or stop" signal unless the front tires of a vehicle cross the stop line after the signal is red.
Title
As enacted, specifies that it is not a violation of a "red alone or stop" signal unless the front tires of a vehicle cross the stop line after the signal is red.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 989 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1274) |
2014-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0875) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans & Safety Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2003 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 989