TN SB2041 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that a person or entity that produces, sells, sends, or distributes obscene matter in violation of state law may be held civilly liable for damages to an injured party. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 9, relative to obscenity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2159 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Conference Committee appointed. (Lamar, Lundberg, Rose, Stevens, Taylor)