TN SB1693 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an office of gun violence prevention within the department of safety with the goal of collecting and analyzing gun violence data in this state to develop and implement strategies to prevent gun violence and mass shootings; places the office in sunset review in 2027. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47 and Title 68, relative to gun violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee with negative recommendation, as amended (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee with negative recommendation, as amended |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2824 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee