TN SB0152 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that "NAIC" means the National Association of Insurance Commissioners "or any successor organization." - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that "NAIC" means the National Association of Insurance Commissioners "or any successor organization." - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-19SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm.
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-28SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0146 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback