TN HJR1189 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Mar'Shea Tachelle Lewis, Salutatorian, Oakhaven High School.
Title
Mar'Shea Tachelle Lewis, Salutatorian, Oakhaven High School.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-05-05 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-17 | House | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-04-17 | House | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-17 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/17/14 |
2014-04-16 | House | Filed for intro. |