TN HB2442 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, allows treasurer, recorder and chief of police to be appointed by majority vote of the aldermen and mayor; permits individuals who live in or within 15 miles of the city limits, rather than just town residents, to serve as corporate officers. - Amends Chapter 450 of the Acts of 1901; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, allows treasurer, recorder and chief of police to be appointed by majority vote of the aldermen and mayor; permits individuals who live in or within 15 miles of the city limits, rather than just town residents, to serve as corporate officers. - Amends Chapter 450 of the Acts of 1901; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Finney L (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Finney L (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | Pr. Ch. 42 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/7/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. adopted am. #1 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-27 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2590 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42