TN SB2590 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, allows treasurer, recorder and chief of police to be appointed by majority vote of the aldermen and mayor; permits individuals who live in or within 15 miles of the city limits, rather than just town residents, to serve as corporate officers. - Amends Chapter 450 of the Acts of 1901; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, allows treasurer, recorder and chief of police to be appointed by majority vote of the aldermen and mayor; permits individuals who live in or within 15 miles of the city limits, rather than just town residents, to serve as corporate officers. - Amends Chapter 450 of the Acts of 1901; as amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 42 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | S. Reset on S. Regular Calendar 3/31/14 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | P2C held on desk. Local Bill |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2442 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-20 - Pr. Ch. 42
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2590&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2590.pdf |