TN HB2319 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, excludes certain charitable organizations that hold auction sales from the definition of "business" for sales and use tax purposes, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, excludes certain charitable organizations that hold auction sales from the definition of "business" for sales and use tax purposes, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1990 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2319&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2319.pdf |