TN SB1990 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, excludes certain charitable organizations that hold auction sales from the definition of "business" for sales and use tax purposes, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, excludes certain charitable organizations that hold auction sales from the definition of "business" for sales and use tax purposes, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2319 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1990&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1990.pdf |