TN HB1617 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, establishes additional qualifications for service as a member of the city's board of waterworks, sewerage, and natural gas by requiring one member to be on the city council, members to be property holders in their places of residence, and members to reside within their respective cities or unincorporated areas for one (1) year preceding their appointment; establishes terms of service for board members; and establishes a procedure for filling vacancies on the board. - Amends Chapter 231 of the Private Acts of 1980.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 231 of the Private Acts of 1980; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to Waterworks, Sewerage and Natural Gas system for the City of Rockwood.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14 | |
2021-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1635 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 14