TN HB1295 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 820
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 820
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that a woman may be prosecuted for assault for the illegal use of a narcotic drug while pregnant, if her child is born addicted to or harmed by the narcotic drug; law expires July 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, provides that a woman may be prosecuted for assault for the illegal use of a narcotic drug while pregnant, if her child is born addicted to or harmed by the narcotic drug; law expires July 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: HOLD ON CLERK'S DESK AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 52 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 820 |
2014-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | Held on desk, Ayes 52, Nays 37, PNV 1 |
2014-03-06 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0609) |
2014-03-06 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0419) |
2014-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2014 |
2014-03-03 | House | Reset on Next Available Regular cal. |
2014-02-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2014 |
2014-02-10 | House | Reset on Regular cal. for 3/03/14 |
2014-02-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/10/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/6/2014 |
2013-04-09 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Action Def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/10/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1391 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 820