TN HB0319 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises tamper resistant prescription requirements to authorize printing with technology that results in a tamper resistant prescription. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 4 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, revises tamper resistant prescription requirements to authorize printing with technology that results in a tamper resistant prescription. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10, Part 4 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 74 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/01/2013 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2013-03-11 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-03-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0060) |
2013-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/11/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0963 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 74