TN HB0001 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the state sales and use tax rate on tangible personal property from seven percent to 6.75 percent. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, reduces the state sales and use tax rate on tangible personal property from seven percent to 6.75 percent. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-11-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2014-11-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0003 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-24 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0001&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0001.pdf |