US HB599 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-11)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3500 West 6th Street, Suite 103 in Los Angeles, California, as the "Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Post Office".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3500 West 6th Street, Suite 103 in Los Angeles, California, as the "Dosan Ahn Chang Ho Post Office".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-01-31 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-01-31 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: 1/29/2024 CR H264) |
2024-01-31 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-01-31 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H358-359) |
2024-01-31 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-01-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Donalds objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2024-01-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 599. |
2024-01-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H264) |
2024-01-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-01-29 | House | Mr. Donalds moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |