SD SB3 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-7)
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2024 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-7)
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2024 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend the length of time allowed for a tax agreement with an Indian tribe.
Title
Extend the length of time allowed for a tax agreement with an Indian tribe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2024 S.J. 232 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on January 30, 2024 S.J. 202 |
2024-01-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 192 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 186 |
2024-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 156 |
2024-01-22 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-22 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 74 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 86 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 1 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 23 |