SD SB157 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to the building South Dakota fund and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to the building South Dakota fund and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-31HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 688
2014-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 773
2014-03-13HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 670
2014-03-13HouseSigned by President S.J. 653
2014-03-12HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 642
2014-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 712
2014-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 711 Amendment 157sa
2014-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 688
2014-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 671
2014-03-05HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 642
2014-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 575
2014-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 456
2014-02-25SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 456 Amendment 157ma
2014-02-24SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 433
2014-02-21SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 401
2014-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-02-04SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 196

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=157&Session=2014
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/docs/legsession/2014/Bills/SB157P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/docs/legsession/2014/Bills/SB157S.pdf
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/docs/legsession/2014/Bills/SB157H.pdf
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/docs/legsession/2014/Bills/SB157ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=16413&Session=2014
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=16560&Session=2014
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=16937&Session=2014
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=17196&Session=2014
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=17247&Session=2014

Bill Comments

feedback