WA HB2441 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a pilot program eliminating college in the high school fees for private not-for-profit four-year institutions.
Title
Establishing a pilot program eliminating college in the high school fees for private not-for-profit four-year institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Chapter 240, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |