SD HB1256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability, to revise the income eligibility requirements for property and sales tax refunds, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability, to revise the income eligibility requirements for property and sales tax refunds, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 H.J. 761 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 681 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 710 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 655 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 632 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 607 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 595 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 551 |
2019-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 570 |
2019-02-25 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed H.J. 530 Amendment 1256zta |
2019-02-25 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. |
2019-02-25 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1256za |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 327 |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 281 |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 264 |