TN HB2326 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 2
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 2
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 10 days to 10 business days, the maximum amount of time the commissioner of education can suspend schools in a year when the commissioner requires all teachers to attend county institutes or educational meetings. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Kevin Raper [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Brock Martin [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 2 |
2024-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 84, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed (Akbari, Lundberg, Powers, Taylor, White). |
2024-04-23 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (G. Hicks, Haston, White, Parkinson) |
2024-04-23 | House | H. refused to recede from S am. no. 2 |
2024-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment 2 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-18 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 2 HB2326 |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0771) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0770) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0864) |
2024-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1003) |
2024-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | Re-ref. Education Administration |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-03-12 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2183 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 82, Nays 3 PNV 0