SD HB1124 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Signed by the Governor on February 20, 2024 H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Signed by the Governor on February 20, 2024 H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the temporary filling of water development district board positions created as a result of population increases.
Title
Provide for the temporary filling of water development district board positions created as a result of population increases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 20, 2024 H.J. 352 |
2024-02-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2024 H.J. 302 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 289 |
2024-02-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 284 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 270 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 203 |
2024-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 188 |
2024-01-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-25 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 144 |