SC S1130 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Building Codes Council, Relating To Irc Section R312.2 Window Fall Protection, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4435, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Window fall protection (D. No. 4435)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-03-25 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-3 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |