RI S2526 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the Rhode Island Access to Medical Technology Innovation Act.
Title
Relating To Health And Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |