RI S2121 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- TEMPORARY DISABILITY INSURANCE -- GENERAL PROVISIONS - Includes siblings, grandchildren, care recipient for temporary caregiver benefits of 12 weeks/Increases weekly dependent's allowances from $10 to $20 or 7% of benefit rate whichever is greater. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
Includes siblings, grandchildren, care recipient for temporary caregiver benefits of 12 weeks/Increases weekly dependent's allowances from $10 to $20 or 7% of benefit rate whichever is greater. Effective January 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Labor And Labor Relations
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- TEMPORARY DISABILITY INSURANCE
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- TEMPORARY DISABILITY INSURANCE -- GENERAL PROVISIONS
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- TEMPORARY DISABILITY INSURANCE
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- TEMPORARY DISABILITY INSURANCE -- GENERAL PROVISIONS