PA SB894 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Act No. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Act No. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in judicial boards and commissions, authorizing the Pennsylvania Board of Law Examiners to obtain criminal history record checks.
Title
In judicial boards and commissions, authorizing the Pennsylvania Board of Law Examiners to obtain criminal history record checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-22 - Senate - SB 894 PN 1504, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | House | Act No. 43 |
2014-05-06 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-04-30 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-04-30 | House | Signed in House |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-4) |
2014-04-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-28 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-28 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-08 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-10-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-10-22 | House | In the House |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-10-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |