PA SB819 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-29 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-29 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for the authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations.
Title
Further providing for the authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-29 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2014-06-27 | House | In the House |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |