PA SB1409 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 1983 (P.L.306, No.84), known as the Board of Vehicles Act, further providing for unlawful acts by manufacturers or distributors.
Title
Further providing for unlawful acts by manufacturers or distributors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Act No. 125 |
2014-07-09 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-09 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Signed in House |
2014-07-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-2) |
2014-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-30 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-26 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2014-06-25 | House | In the House |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |