PA SB1356 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 22, 1974 (P.L.589, No.205), known as the Unfair Insurance Practices Act, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 182 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-07 | House | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2014-09-16 | House | In the House |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |