PA HR716 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to study the issue of workplace pay disparity, to reexamine existing Federal and State laws relating to that issue and to make recommendations to the General Assembly.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to study the issue of workplace pay disparity, to reexamine existing Federal and State laws relating to that issue and to make recommendations to the General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Amended and Adopted (199-2) |
2014-04-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-17 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |