PA HB235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in petition for adoption, further providing for consents necessary to adoption; in support matters generally, further providing for costs and fees and for State disbursement unit; and, in child protective services, further proving for employees having contact with children, adoptive and foster parents and for volunteers having contact with children.
Title
In petition for adoption, further providing for consents necessary to adoption; in support matters generally, further providing for costs and fees and for State disbursement unit; and, in child protective services, further proving for employees having contact with children, adoptive and foster parents and for volunteers having contact with children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 235 PN 2265, CONCUR (Y: 183 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 235 PN 2265, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 235 PN 877, FP (Y: 134 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 235 PN 205, 2019 A135, B. MILLER (Y: 158 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 235 PN 205, 2019 A145, TOOHIL (Y: 157 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 235 PN 2265, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 235 PN 877, FP (Y: 134 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 235 PN 205, 2019 A135, B. MILLER (Y: 158 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 235 PN 205, 2019 A145, TOOHIL (Y: 157 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Act No. 47 |
2019-07-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-28 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (183-13) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-06-27 | House | In the House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-18) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-03-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (134-56) |
2019-03-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-03-11 | House | Removed from table |
2019-02-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-02-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |