PA HB2299 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in penalties, further providing for children in polling places and voting compartments or voting machine booths.
Title
In penalties, further providing for children in polling places and voting compartments or voting machine booths.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-17 | Removed from table | |
2010-03-16 | Laid on the table | |
2010-03-16 | First consideration | |
2010-03-16 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |