PA HB2280 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 2A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 2A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Title
Making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 2A |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-05-29 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |