PA HB1801 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for the Office for Safe Schools.
Title
Further providing for the Office for Safe Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-29 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-10-23 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |