PA HB1590 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, further providing for basic and continuing education programs for tax collectors; providing for criminal history record information; and further providing for notice of taxes and for deputy tax collectors.
Title
Further providing for basic and continuing education programs for tax collectors; providing for criminal history record information; and further providing for notice of taxes and for deputy tax collectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-22 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 164 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (186-5) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-07 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-06 | House | In the House |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (40-9) |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-8) |
2014-06-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-04 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-02 | House | Removed from table |
2014-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-07 | House | First consideration |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-27 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |