OR SCR205 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honors the life and memory of Dick Springer. (Flesch Readability Score: 71.8). In memoriam: Dick Springer, 1948-2023.
Title
In memoriam: Dick Springer, 1948-2023.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Wagner [D] | Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2024-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Read. Carried by Mannix. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Cramer; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Scharf. |
2024-03-06 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2024-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Lieber. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Carried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |