OR SB1530 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Effective date, April 17, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Effective date, April 17, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gives money to OHCS, OHA, DHS, DOE, OBDD, ODOT, WRD and DAS for programs. Goes into effect when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). [Digest: Gives money to OHCS, OHA, DHS, DOE and DAS for programs. Goes into effect when the Governor signs it. (Flesch Readability Score: 81.4).] Appropriates moneys to and modifies expenditure limitations for the Housing and Community Services Department, Oregon Health Authority, Department of Human Services, State Department of Energy, Oregon Business Development Department, Department of Transportation, Water Resources Department and Oregon Department of Administrative Services for various programs. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Effective date, April 17, 2024. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chapter 109, 2024 Laws. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg, Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Cate, Hieb, Reschke, Stout, Yunker; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Hartman. |
2024-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Thatcher. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Knopp declared potential conflict of interest. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Anderson, Woods. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Hansell. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development, then Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |