OR HB2706 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes annual management fee on each primary or supplemental water right. Provides for deposit of management fee moneys into Water Resources Department Water Right Operating Fund. Revises permissible use of moneys from fund. Authorizes collection and assessment for annual periods beginning on or after July 1, 2017. Allows phased imposition of assessment and collection during period beginning July 1, 2017, and ending July 1, 2019, subject to constitutional restrictions. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to management fees for water rights; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass, rescind subsequent referral to Revenue, and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-21 | House | Subsequent referral to Revenue rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Revenue be rescinded, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |