OK SB789 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB789
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Employment Security Commission; modifying restriction for certain contribution rate increase; providing procedures to supplement financial condition of certain fund during certain state of emergency. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Employment Security Commission; modifying restriction for certain contribution rate increase; providing procedures to supplement financial condition of certain fund during certain state of emergency. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3 |
2021-04-12 | House | General Order |
2021-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB789 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021