OK SB597 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB597
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; modifying qualifications for membership; modifying certain procedures for disciplinary action; establishing Anesthesiologist Assistants Advisory Committee. Effective date.
Title
State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; modifying qualifications for membership; modifying certain procedures for disciplinary action; establishing Anesthesiologist Assistants Advisory Committee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: establishing Anesthesiologist Assistants (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: establishing Anesthesiologist Assistants (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2024 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | General Order |
2023-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2023-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB597 (Carry Over) 2023-04-13 - CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee