OK SB2018 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; limited lines producers; modifying coverage requirements. Effective date
Title
Insurance; limited lines producers; modifying coverage requirements. Effective date
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/22/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Kirby (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |