OK SB1777 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health; requiring veterans centers to be designated nonsmoking by certain date. Effective date.
Title
Public health; requiring veterans centers to be designated nonsmoking by certain date. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 11 |
2014-04-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Ownbey (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |