OK SB1664 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Health; increasing certain limit for Oklahoma Dental Loan Repayment Program. Effective date.
Title
Department of Health; increasing certain limit for Oklahoma Dental Loan Repayment Program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Health and Social Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Health and Social Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 2712 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2713 | New Code | See Bill Text |