OK SB1218 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health; relating to peer review information. Effective date.
Title
Public health; relating to peer review information. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/13/2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 5 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | House | General Order |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1709 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 709 | New Code | See Bill Text |