OK HB3595 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; Employment Security Act of 1980; modifying seeking and accepting of work; requiring Commission to maintain online jobs center; requiring cross-check and investigation of claims; effective date.
Title
Labor; Employment Security Act of 1980; modifying seeking and accepting of work; requiring Commission to maintain online jobs center; requiring cross-check and investigation of claims; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Jerry Alvord [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2024 |
2024-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 9 |
2024-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13 |
2024-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Alvord (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |